ABS Realisations Limited

Charity number: 1103321
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 26 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 28 November 2020 151 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

28 November 2020 151 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 17 January 2020 201 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

17 January 2020 201 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 20 December 2018 173 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 20 December 2018 173 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 23 August 2017 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 23 August 2017 54 days late Download