ABS Realisations Limited

Charity number: 1103321
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £4.27m £3.33m £6.79m £3.99m £8.00k
Total expenditure £4.69m £4.91m £5.10m £6.27m £1.73m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A £18.03k N/A
Income from government grants £32.71k £33.09k £27.20k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £55.76k £207.98k £3.10m £60.00k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £62.89k £69.44k £34.26k £147.62k N/A
Income - Charitable activities £2.37m £3.04m £3.50m £3.28m N/A
Income - Endowments £897 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £18.47k £13.34k £3.70k £7.38k N/A
Income - Other £1.76m £56 £155.96k £494.04k N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.33m £4.87m £5.08m £5.46m N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £358.11k £45.64k £26.39k £801.85k N/A
Expenditure - Governance £33.28k £60.31k £66.86k £244.60k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £897 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A