FRIENDS OF FOLKESTONE ACADEMY LTD

Charity number: 1103352
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2021 02 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 02 November 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2020 19 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 19 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2019 30 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 01 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2018 15 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 08 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2017 02 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 31 July 2017 On time Download