UBUNTU PATHWAYS

Charity number: 1103749
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £596.45k £750.23k £1.10m £1.05m £1.03m
Total expenditure £652.29k £721.46k £1.05m £1.27m £1.19m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £596.43k £750.21k £1.10m £1.05m £1.02m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £15 £27 £49 £196 £133
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £8.09k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £574.58k £639.87k £979.63k £800.12k £1.10m
Expenditure - Raising funds £77.72k £81.59k £67.48k £72.14k £40.79k
Expenditure - Governance £8.00k £4.62k £4.80k £4.64k £4.80k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £400.00k £50.00k