BREADSALL C.E. PRIMARY SCHOOL PTFA

Charity number: 1103424
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To organise fund raising events for Breadsall C of E School.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £6,125
Total expenditure: £3,982

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Derbyshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 April 2004: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nicola Jacobs Chair 21 July 2023
None on record
Pat Smith Trustee 20 September 2023
None on record
Ruth Duxbury Trustee 23 June 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £1.81k £1.86k £1.16k £3.95k £6.13k
Total expenditure £3.17k £2.11k £1.13k £4.35k £3.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 23 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 17 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 31 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 30 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 08 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Breadsall C Of E Primary School
51 Brookside Road
Breadsall
DERBY
DE21 5LF
Phone:
01332831328