Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF BURPHAM CHURCH

Charity number: 1103789
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 15 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 21 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 28 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required