Accounts and annual returns ST AIDANS SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1103798
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 17 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 18 October 2021 140 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 24 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 24 September 2019 116 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 15 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required