Accounts and annual returns ST PATRICKS PRIMARY SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1103744
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 13 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 06 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 06 November 2020 99 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 30 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 22 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required