Financial history ST PATRICKS PRIMARY SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1103744
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £8.59k £5.99k £4.26k £2.34k £1.25k
Total expenditure £7.68k £4.17k £7.36k £1.51k £1.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A