Accounts and annual returns THE ST MARY'S BARNARD CASTLE PARISH HALL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1103536
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 05 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 17 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 November 2020 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 13 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 09 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required