Accounts and annual returns THE MUSGRAVE CHURCH FIELD TRUST

Charity number: 1103622
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 25 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 March 2022 145 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 16 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 24 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required