Financial history THE MUSGRAVE CHURCH FIELD TRUST

Charity number: 1103622
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £1.24k £2.90k £1.03k £0 £0
Total expenditure £2.98k £5.61k £3.00k £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A