ETHNIC MINORITY TRAINING & EDUCATION PROJECT NORTH EAST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Training, Education, Community Work, Youth Work
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Gateshead
- Middlesbrough
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 06 May 2004: Standard registration
- EMTEP NORTH EAST (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DJAMAL BOUCHELOUCHE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Abbas Rafi | Trustee | 15 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
HASAN TARIQ | Trustee | 24 February 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £99.26k | £146.50k | £25.33k | £9.26k | £9.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £89.77k | £108.85k | £18.05k | £16.85k | £16.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £79.95k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £115.54k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 August 2024 | 204 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 May 2023 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 May 2023 | 104 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 March 2022 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 March 2022 | 54 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10 SEPTEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY THROUGH ARRANGING, PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF, TRAINING AND FACILITIES FOR THE INHABITANTS OF NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE WHO ARE UNEMPLOYED, OR ANY RESIDENT WHO HAS RECENTLY LEFT PRISON OR IS AT RISK OR CONSIDERED TO BE AT RISK OF OFFENDING OR RE-OFFENDING. 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE INHABITANTS OF NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE WHO ARE UNEMPLOYED, OR ANY RESIDENT WHO HAS RECENTLY LEFT PRISON OR IS AT RISK OR CONSIDERED TO BE AT RISK OF OFFENDING OR RE-OFFENDING, AND THE INHABITANTS OF NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE GENERALLY, IN IT SKILLS AND ENGLISH THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND TRAINING.
Area of benefit
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
Contact information
- Address:
-
E M T E P
2 Shipley Avenue
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE4 9RA
- Phone:
- 078111164299
- Email:
- info@emtep.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window