Accounts and annual returns ST MARGARET'S CEVAP SCHOOL PTA (IPSWICH)

Charity number: 1103840
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 19 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 11 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 11 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 16 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required