Accounts and annual returns BANKFOOT PARTNERSHIP
Charity number: 1103929

Charity reporting is overdue by 1614 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 153 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 153 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 518 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 518 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 883 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 883 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | Overdue | Overdue by 1249 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Overdue | Overdue by 1249 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | Overdue | Overdue by 1614 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Overdue | Overdue by 1614 days |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window