FRIENDS OF THE CONVENT OF JESUS AND MARY INFANT SCHOOL AND NURSERY

Charity number: 1103910
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £24.93k £23.44k £15.16k £23.61k £10.86k
Total expenditure £9.05k £16.13k £30.74k £20.33k £1.40k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A