BEDFORD AFRICAN COMMUNITY SUPPORT PROJECT

Charity number: 1104709
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 27 May 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1136 days
Accounts and TAR 27 May 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1136 days
Annual return 27 May 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1501 days
Accounts and TAR 27 May 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1501 days
Annual return 27 May 2015 Overdue Overdue by 1866 days
Accounts and TAR 27 May 2015 Overdue Overdue by 1866 days
Annual return 27 May 2014 Overdue Overdue by 2232 days
Accounts and TAR 27 May 2014 Overdue Overdue by 2232 days
Annual return 27 May 2013 Overdue Overdue by 2597 days
Accounts and TAR 27 May 2013 Overdue Overdue by 2597 days