BEDFORD AFRICAN COMMUNITY SUPPORT PROJECT

Charity number: 1104709
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 27/05/2008 27/05/2009 27/05/2010 27/05/2011 27/05/2012
Total gross income £2.62k £12.36k £9.75k £9.85k £0
Total expenditure £2.56k £12.03k £7.24k £9.65k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A