THE HOPE CENTRE ST HELENS

Charity number: 1103903
Charity reporting is up to date (50 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 February 2021 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 22 March 2021 50 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 22 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 22 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 21 February 2019 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 27 February 2018 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

28 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 01 March 2017 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

23 December 2016 On time Download