ST ANDREW'S SCHOOL (CHEDWORTH) PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1104020
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 05 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 05 October 2020 97 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 30 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 02 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 16 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required