ST ANDREW'S SCHOOL (CHEDWORTH) PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1104020
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £4.79k £4.72k £5.50k £8.70k £7.48k
Total expenditure £4.83k £4.31k £3.13k £4.76k £4.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A