Accounts and annual returns THE WESTMINSTER ACADEMY (WESTBOURNE GREEN)
Charity number: 1103958
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2010 | 06 June 2011 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2010 | 20 December 2010 | On time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2009 | 12 May 2010 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2009 | 23 April 2010 | On time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2008 | 19 January 2009 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2008 | 19 January 2009 | On time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2007 | 10 July 2008 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2007 | 30 June 2008 | On time |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window