CROSSROADS CARE EAST ANGLIA LIMITED

Charity Number: 1103959
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To relieve the stresses experienced by carers and beneficiaries by providing practical & emotional support to carers responsible for the care of children, adults or older people at home who have a physical or sensory disability, learning disability, mental health problem or who are chronically ill. Beneficiaries are people who have care needs and carers are people involved in the provision of care

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2014

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex
  • Norfolk
  • Suffolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 May 2004: Standard registration
  • 13 March 2015: Funds received from 1090844 UTTLESFORD CROSSROADS- CARING FOR CARERS
  • 20 March 2015: Funds received from 1130265 CROSSROADS CARING FOR CARERS IN NORWICH AND EAST N...
  • 01 April 2015: Funds received from 1091389 WEST SUFFOLK CROSSROADS CARING FOR CARERS
  • 26 June 2015: Funds received from 1094267 CROSS ROADS CARE SOUTH EAST SUFFOLK
  • 17 September 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • CROSSROADS CARE IN NORFOLK (Working name)
  • CROSSROADS CARING FOR CARERS IN NORFOLK LTD (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014
Total gross income £948.88k £1.00m £969.28k £2.56m £2.80m
Total expenditure £926.31k £986.24k £975.60k £3.10m £2.86m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £18.98k £22.06k £25.64k £61.38k £47.13k
Income - Other trading activities £3.31k £2.58k £2.68k £5.65k £6.04k
Income - Charitable activities £2.97k £9.00k £937.88k £2.49m £2.74m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.45k £3.11k £3.07k £3.23k £620
Income - Other £920.18k £964.18k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.34k £1.34k £939.43k £3.01m £2.85m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £6.28k £6.75k £6.54k £73.60k £15.60k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £918.69k £978.15k £28.29k £14.22k £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014
Own use assets £11.75k £9.75k £6.30k £17.24k £11.73k
Long-term investments £238 £267 £256 £298 £267
Other assets £337.19k £317.85k £437.09k £1.03m £746.10k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £142.75k £106.76k £228.86k £808.68k £588.95k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not submitted