QUAGGY WATERWAYS ACTION GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
With respect to the River Quaggy and its tributaries QWAG: (a) identifies and promotes opportunities for restoration of the river corridor. (b) monitors developments affecting the river corridor to ensure improvements are achieved. (c) promotes an understanding of urban rivers as community assets. (d) informs a wider audience of our work as an example of community-led regeneration.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Bromley
- Greenwich
- Lewisham
Governance
- 07 June 2004: Standard registration
- QWAG (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL DE ZYLVA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Michael Johannes Keogh | Trustee | 20 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA ANN ZOLLICOFFER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARIA DO CARMO DE JESUS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £916 | £1.06k | £522 | £4.41k | £3.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.42k | £1.52k | £735 | £1.52k | £2.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 SEPTEMBER 2002
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF QUAGGY RIVER AND ITS TRIBUTARIES INCLUDING ITS FLORA AND FAUNA FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
178 INCHMERY ROAD
LONDON
SE6 1DF
- Phone:
- 02086977149
- Email:
- qwag@qwag.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window