Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF DUNSTON SCHOOL, LINCOLN

Charity number: 1104266
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 29 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 13 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 19 August 2020 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 16 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 27 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required