BRADFORD AFRICAN WOMEN ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1104222
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 189 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 189 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 555 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 555 days
Annual return 31 December 2017 Overdue Overdue by 920 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Overdue Overdue by 920 days
Annual return 31 December 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1285 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1285 days
Annual return 31 December 2015 Overdue Overdue by 1650 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Overdue Overdue by 1650 days