TIPTON YOUTH PROJECT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide training and support to improve life-skills in children and young people, to empower them to make better life choices and enabling them to remain safe and healthy. To improve their self-esteem and grow in confidence so they are able to make a positive contribution to society. We work in participation with local communities, schools and faith groups to end the cycle of low aspirations
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Sandwell
Governance
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2019 | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.72k | £13.44k | £11.00k | £11.00k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.39k | £18.78k | £7.43k | £7.43k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 20 May 2024 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 25 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 12 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 APRIL 2004
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH PARTICULARLY (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION) AMONGST CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE; 2. ADVANCE EDUCATION PARTICULARLY (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION) AMONGST CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL, PHYSICAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES; AND 3. TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE BOARD MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
TIPTON AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window