THE CAPTIVE ANIMALS' PROTECTION TRUST

Charity number: 1104400
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 23 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 14 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2018 08 February 2020 161 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2017 18 February 2019 171 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2016 08 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 Not Required