Accounts and annual returns CROYDON SCHOOLS' MUSIC ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1108453
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 22 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 09 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 13 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 27 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2017 19 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required