CROYDON SCHOOLS' MUSIC ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1108453
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £5.34k £4.84k £4.47k £17.93k £1.43k
Total expenditure £3.18k £3.92k £5.05k £3.93k £3.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £15.10k N/A