THALIA THEATRE COMPANY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Thalia Theatre Company is an independent educational arts related learning provider for disabled adults and young people with physical and sensory impairments and learning difficulties in particular but not exclusively. We operate 'arts' related learning day opportunities for disabled people post 18 years. The artistic remit of the company is 'Theatre for Empowerment and Social Change'.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Norfolk
Governance
- 27 July 2004: Standard registration
- 22 October 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THALIA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/05/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £109.92k | £88.27k | £88.06k | £90.72k | £24.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £120.32k | £99.07k | £106.02k | £100.87k | £118.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £26.71k | £83.03k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.21k | £1.21k | £1.21k | £1.21k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 November 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 17 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 17 November 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 29 November 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 29 November 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 MARCH 2004 AS AMENDED 12 JULY 2004 AND 23 MAY 2009
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS WITH PHYSICAL OR LEARNING DIFFICULTIES, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THROUGH THE PROMOTION OF THE ARTS PARTICULARLY THE ARTS OF DRAMA AND DANCE AND RELATED ACTIVITIES WITH A VIEW TO DEVELOPING LIFE SKILLS AND IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window