BILLINGLEY VILLAGE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1104405
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 02 December 2019 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 26 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 12 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 18 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 20 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 13 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required