Financial history THE HEPATITIS C TRUST

Charity number: 1104279
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £815.24k £1.64m £2.77m £3.63m £4.99m
Total expenditure £879.73k £1.41m £2.34m £3.04m £4.41m
Income from government contracts N/A £871.37k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £99.81k N/A £455.83k £883.67k £2.21m
Income - Donations and legacies £195.34k £208.10k £323.15k £273.20k £210.44k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £47.92k £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £619.91k £1.42m £2.40m £3.34m £4.78m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £24 £192 £151 £336
Income - Other £0 £19.71k £5.13k £20.30k £5.38k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £749.34k £1.21m £2.10m £2.81m £4.24m
Expenditure - Raising funds £130.39k £199.44k £180.47k £210.09k £172.83k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £53.49k £20.30k £0