Accounts and annual returns ST ANDREW'S (BURGESS HILL) PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1104242
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 02 March 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 02 March 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 24 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 24 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 13 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 13 May 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 17 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 17 February 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 20 December 2019 173 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 20 December 2019 173 days late Download Open in new window