Financial history ST ANDREW'S (BURGESS HILL) PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1104242
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £317.60k £396.73k £466.99k £512.28k £482.05k
Total expenditure £268.38k £360.04k £432.71k £541.62k £491.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £385.98k £456.17k £402.89k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £54.94k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £4.19k N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £453.15k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £9 N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £502.54k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £3.22k N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £1.06k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £35.86k N/A