SEBASTIAN'S ACTION TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing respite breaks and day visits at The Bluebells, a purpose built faclity in Hampshire for seriously-ill children and their families.These children have life limiting or life threatening conditions and come from all over the UK. We provide practical support in Berks,Hants,Surrey & Bucks including emergency transport, wellbeing therapy, sibling support, help at home and bereavement care.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bracknell Forest
- Buckinghamshire
- Hampshire
- Oxfordshire
- Slough
- Surrey
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Wokingham
Governance
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £280.17k | £432.85k | £421.16k | £497.22k | £318.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £187.61k | £215.30k | £348.24k | £475.56k | £333.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 18 September 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | 18 September 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 13 August 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | 13 August 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 01 October 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | 01 October 2012 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 23 MARCH 2004, AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 9 AUGUST 2004
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND DISTRESS OF CHILDREN SUFFERING FROM CANCER AND OTHER LIFE THREATENING ILLNESS, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE TREATED AT THE JOHN RADCLIFFE HOSPITAL OXFORD AND HELEN HOUSE HOSPICE FOR CHILDREN OXFORD, AND TO SUPPORT THEIR FAMILIES BY SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF HOLIDAY ACCOMMODATION AND FACILITIES FOR RECREATION WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window