ST MARY MAGDALENE COF E (VA) PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER GROUP

Charity number: 1104268
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1013 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1013 days
Annual return 30 September 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1378 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1378 days
Annual return 30 September 2015 Overdue Overdue by 1743 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2015 Overdue Overdue by 1743 days
Annual return 30 September 2014 Overdue Overdue by 2109 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2014 Overdue Overdue by 2109 days
Annual return 30 September 2013 11 January 2014 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2013 Not Required