ST MARY MAGDALENE COF E (VA) PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER GROUP

Charity number: 1104268
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2009 30/09/2010 30/09/2011 30/09/2012 30/09/2013
Total gross income £1.39k £4.26k £1.70k £1.57k £1.59k
Total expenditure £1.32k £1.69k £3.40k £2.44k £880
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A