Financial history THE CAMPDEN CHARITIES TRUSTEE

Charity number: 1104616
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £3.82m £4.06m £4.04m £3.05m £3.41m
Total expenditure £3.53m £3.46m £3.76m £3.40m £3.78m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £100 £0 £0 £14 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £40.28k £52.83k £63.99k £93.04k £43.98k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.76m £3.99m £3.96m £2.95m £3.36m
Income - Other £26.79k £15.70k £15.57k £4.35k £5.93k
Income - Legacies £100 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.83m £2.40m £2.76m £2.35m £2.68m
Expenditure - Raising funds £699.53k £817.40k £761.39k £740.22k £801.57k
Expenditure - Governance £232.29k £244.86k £246.67k £294.14k £2.23m
Expenditure - Grants institution £351.63k £351.63k £277.60k £422.00k £449.38k
Expenditure - Investment management £699.53k £817.40k £761.39k £740.22k £801.57k
Expenditure - Other £0 £244.86k £246.67k £308.64k £303.51k