Trustees THE CAMPDEN CHARITIES TRUSTEE
Charity number: 1104616

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charles Patrick Ralph Sandys Manners | Chair | 24 April 2018 |
|
|||||
Catherine Faulks | Trustee | 22 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Mike Richards | Trustee | 28 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rory Anderson | Trustee | 22 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Thomas | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christopher Mark Townsley | Trustee | 26 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Justine Soulieux | Trustee | 26 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
FRANCES MANTHOS | Trustee | 27 June 2017 |
|
|||||
Robert Orr-Ewing | Trustee | 23 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Hawkins | Trustee | 23 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT ATKINSON | Trustee | 29 July 2013 |
|
|||||
JULIE ANNE MILLS | Trustee | 29 July 2013 |
|
|||||
SAM BERWICK | Trustee | 30 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr CHRISTOPHER OLGA DAVIS | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.