ZICHRON MEIR LIMITED

Charity number: 1104523
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 COVID filing extension granted Download
Annual return 31 May 2019 31 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 31 March 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2018 28 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 28 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2017 28 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 28 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2016 30 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 30 March 2017 On time Download