THE INNOCENT FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1104289
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 03 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 03 February 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 05 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 05 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 28 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 28 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 15 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 15 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 16 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 16 November 2016 On time Download