Financial history THE INNOCENT FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1104289
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £1.00m £1.01m £1.00m £999.86k £1.00m
Total expenditure £597.64k £913.95k £1.43m £1.58m £1.09m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £951.03k £955.80k £950.15k £949.64k £949.73k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.48k £3.82k £4.74k £215 £51.03k
Income - Other £50.00k £50.00k £50.00k £50.00k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £597.64k £913.95k £1.43m £1.58m £1.09m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £48.06k £0 £53.53k £37.59k £9.22k
Expenditure - Grants institution £456.25k £0 £1.28m £1.44m £881.98k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0