Financial history THE BEDE GRIFFITHS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1106071
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £57.36k £59.20k £101.91k £64.68k £46.66k
Total expenditure £60.47k £55.23k £75.68k £69.66k £62.63k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A