Heritage and Communities Trust

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The preservation of the Grade 2 listed Victorian pump house at Low Hall and its Marshall pumping engines and ancillary equipment; the creation and operation of a heritage museum on the site dedicated to the history of pumps and pumping, reciprocating steam engines, local transport, fire fighting and manufacturing in Walthamstow and the Lea Valley.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
Total income includes £950 from 1 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Waltham Forest
Governance
- 23 June 2004: Standard registration
- Markfield Beam Engine and Museum (Working name)
- THE PUMP HOUSE E17 THE LEA VALLEY EXPERIENCE (Working name)
- Walthamstow Pumphouse Museum (Working name)
- THE PUMP HOUSE STEAM & TRANSPORT MUSEUM TRUST (Previous name)
- WALTHAMSTOW PUMPHOUSE MUSEUM (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Lewis | Chair | 23 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Sally Bruce | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Arielle Murphy | Trustee | 04 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Britt | Trustee | 04 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon Oliver | Trustee | 04 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alison Lee | Trustee | 04 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katie Ann Smith | Trustee | 31 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian McLaughlin | Trustee | 23 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosalind Anne Dore | Trustee | 16 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Yull | Trustee | 07 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
MAUREEN BLUNDEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £65.44k | £56.64k | £99.49k | £115.69k | £159.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.64k | £58.21k | £99.54k | £94.43k | £133.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | £950 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION CONVERSION CONVERSION 06 APR 2021 as amended on 31 Aug 2024 as amended on 12 Mar 2025
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE INITIATE ADVANCE ENCOURAGE ADMINISTER SUPPORT AND PROCURE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE THE COLLECTION RESTORATION RECONSTITUTION RENOVATION REINSTATEMENT REPLACEMENT REPRODUCTION AND EXHIBITION OF SITES BUILDINGS PUMPS ENGINES PLANT EQUIPMENT APPARATUS DEVICES GADGETS CONTRIVANCES EXHIBITS PLANS MODELS AND INVENTIONS OF HISTORICAL AND TECHNICAL INTEREST PARTICULARLY AS THEY MAY RELATE TO THE ESTABLISHMENT MAINTENANCE AND DEVELOPMENT OF THE SUPPLY OF WATER THE TREATMENT AND DISPOSAL OF SEWAGE THE HANDLING OF SURFACE WATER AND/OR WHERE THEY ARE ASSOCIATED ASPECTS OF SCHEMES FOR THE IMPROVEMENT OF ARRANGEMENTS FOR THE PUBLIC HEALTH.
Area of benefit
MARKHOUSE, WALTHAMSTOW, LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Walthamstow Pumphouse Museum
10 South Access Road
LONDON
E17 8AX
- Phone:
- 02085211766
- Website:
-
walthamstowpumphouse.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window