COMMUNITIES WELFARE NETWORK

Charity number: 1104662
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1193 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1193 days
Annual return 31 March 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1558 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1558 days
Annual return 31 March 2015 28 January 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 28 January 2016 On time
Annual return 31 March 2014 12 January 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 12 January 2015 On time
Annual return 31 March 2013 17 October 2013 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 17 October 2013 On time