SNARESBROOK PRIMARY PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising activities to provide funds for Snaresbrook Primary School
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Redbridge
Governance
- 15 June 2004: Standard registration
- SNARESBROOK PTA (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rosemary Centeno Williams | Chair | 12 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Michael Smart | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sujata Suzy Essex | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shelima Louwsma | Trustee | 21 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Cate Jolley | Trustee | 07 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.50k | £13.19k | £10.55k | £24.96k | £28.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.14k | £12.66k | £4.47k | £29.44k | £10.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 08 August 2024 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 08 August 2024 | 39 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 14 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 OCTOBER 2003
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL, IN PARTICULAR BY: 2.1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2.2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BUT IN PRACTICE REDBRIDGE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Snaresbrook Primary School
Meadow Walk
LONDON
E18 2EN
- Phone:
- 02089899975
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window