BRENTWOOD LEISURE TRUST

Charity number: 1104395
Charity reporting is overdue by 262 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 262 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 262 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 29 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 27 June 2019 147 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 27 June 2019 147 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 06 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 06 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 05 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 26 September 2016 On time Download