Financial history FORWARD THINKING

Charity number: 1105206
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £1.09m £734.37k £963.71k £625.18k £563.42k
Total expenditure £783.03k £928.32k £739.11k £633.19k £603.54k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £152.65k £734.37k £963.71k £625.18k £563.42k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £937.19k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £733.35k £928.32k £739.11k £633.19k £603.54k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £49.68k £60.82k £61.14k £34.61k £62.05k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0