BODY MIND & SPIRIT (NORFOLK)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Norfolk
Governance
- 24 September 2004: Standard registration
- 08 May 2007: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- BODY MIND & SPIRIT (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2005 | 14 December 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2005 | 14 December 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 17 SEPTEMBER 2003 AS AMENDED ON 15 SEPTEMBER 2004
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ('THE OBJECTS') ARE: TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY (IN PARTICULAR IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND/OR ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION) AS THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE DETERMINES FROM TIME TO TIME IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: 1. ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN (AGED 3+) THROUGH THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF A PROGRAMME (BASED WITHIN THE CHRISTIAN CHURCH) OF HIGH QUALITY CREATIVE AND EDUCATIONAL PLAY IN SUCH A WAY AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES SO THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED; 2. ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE PROVISION OF TRAINING IN THIS TYPE OF PROGRAMME, IN PARTICULAR TO PROFESSIONAL AND VOLUNTEER PRACTITIONERS; AND 3. ADVANCING RELIGIOUS UNDERSTANDING BY MAKING THE SAID PROGRAMME AVAILABLE TO SCHOOLS, PROVIDING THE PUPILS WITH A MORE GENERAL UNDERSTANDING OF SPIRITUALITY (INCLUDING THE AREAS OF: SPIRITUAL, SOCIAL AND EMOTIONAL DEVELOPMENT).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE NORFOLF.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window